How to solve ibps bank aptitude questions in 36 seconds?

Hi friends, We have allotted only 36 seconds to solve ibps bank aptitude questions. Is it possible to do this? Ya sure, there is a chance. There are many books, materials and websites are giving lot of shortcuts, but we dont know the reason why we are failing?. Because we are studying all the things, but we are not taking upto to mind, lack of practice. 
 
IBPS PO cut off mark for aptitude is below 7 only.Ok, No problem here you will achieve it through my ideas, shortcuts. 
 
First of all i will teach you some shortcuts. Can you solve these questions in 6 seconds?
 
1. (65)^2  = ? (square of 65?) 
2. 12345 x 99999
3. 1234 x 11
​4. √1444 = ?
5. 56^2 
​6. ∛205379 
7. 343 x 999
8. 35^2 
9. 23 x 27 
10. 44^2
11. √3844
12. 32421 x 11
13. ∛39304
14. 74 x 76
15. 97 x 96 
1. 65^2 =?
We need to calculate square for 65, The given number is ending with 5. So use this below shortcut (calculate square and number ending with 5)
Step 1: unit digit 5 x 5 = 25
Step 2: second digit 6 x (6+1) = 42
Ans : write step2 ans, step1 ans together = 4225
For Eg : 35^2
5 x 5 = 25
3 x (3+1) = 12
Ans = 1225
​2. 12345 x 99999
Shortcut for Number multiplied by 9 series (9,99,999,9999)
​12345 × 99999 = ?​
Step 1: For the above calculation you just minus 1 from the number then you will get 12344.
Step 2: Subtract the 12344 from 99999, you will get 87655.
Step 3: Finally write the both step 1,step 2 answers together.1234487655 is the answer.
12345 × 99999                                                                 
Step 1:  12345-1=12344                          
Step 2:   99999-12344=87655                          
Step 3: 1234487655 (answer)
​NOTE: If no of 9’s are more than no of digits in number means just add 0’s infront of the number.(eg:00123× 99999).If no of digits in number is more than no of 9’s means dont use this technique.
3. 1234 x 11 = ?
Step 1: Add 0 before and after the number  012340
Step 2: add digits right to left 0+4=4, 4+3=7,3+2=5,2+1=3,1+0=1
Step 3: write the added result together from right 13574.
For Eg: 11 x 11
Step 1: 0110
Step 2: 0+1=1; 1+1=2; 1+0=1
Step 1: Ans = 121.
4. √1444 = ?
Table For Square And Cube
NUMBER SQUARE CUBE
1 1 1
2 4 8
3 9 27
4 16 64
5 25 125
6 36 216
7 49 343
8 64 512
9 81 729
10 100 1000
11 121 1331
12 144 1728
13 169 2107
14 196 2744
15 225 3375
16 256 4096
17 289 4913
18 324 5832
19 361 6859
20 400 8000

From the above table you will find squares are not ending with 2,3,7,8. But cubes are ending with 1,2,3,4,5,6,7,8,9.
We need to calculate square root of 1444.
Step 1: Split the number into two parts 14, 44 (last two digits are one part, remaining are one part); 44 is ending with 4 so the unit digit of square root ending with only 2 or 8.
2^2 = 4 ; 8^2 = 64 ;
Step 2: First part 14 is in between 3^2 to 4^2 (between 9 to 16)
so the second digit of square root is 3 or 4. In this case always you should take small number. Here small number is 3. 
Step 3: We have found one digit is 3, what is the unit digit? (2 or 8). For this, take first part which is close to 3^2 to 4^2. It is close to 4^2 (16) only. so take 8 as second digit.
Step 4: Write first part answer(3) and second part answer(2) together.Hence Answer is 38.
5. 56^2 = ?
(50+6)^2;
Step 1: 50^2 = 2500 —-(1)
Step 1: 6 x 100 = 600 —-(2)
Step 1: 6^2 = 36 —-(3)
Add step 1,2,3 Answers = 2500+3600+36 = 3136
​Answer is 3136.
​6. ∛205379

Table For Square And Cube
NUMBER SQUARE CUBE
1 1 1
2 4 8
3 9 27
4 16 64
5 25 125
6 36 216
7 49 343
8 64 512
9 81 729
10 100 1000
11 121 1331
12 144 1728
13 169 2107
14 196 2744
15 225 3375
16 256 4096
17 289 4913
18 324 5832
19 361 6859
20 400 8000

We need to find cube root of 205379, see the above table
Step 1: Split the number into two parts 205, 379 (last three digits are one part, remaining are one part); 
Note* : For square root calculations (we have splitted last two digits are one part, remaining are one part). for square and cube root we should know values from 1^2—— to 25^2,1^3—–to 10^3 are necessary​.
379 is ending with 9 so the unit digit of cube root ending with only 9.
9^3 = 729 ;
Step 2: First part 205 is in between 5^3 to 6^3 (between 125 to 216)
so the second digit of square root is 5 or 6. In this case always you should take small number. Here small number is 5. 
Step 3: We have found second digit 5, the unit digit is 9. 
Step 4: Hence Answer is 59.
7. 343 x 999 = ?
​343× 999 = ?
​Step 1: For the above calculation you just minus 1 from the number then you will get 342.
Step 2: Subtract the 342 from 999, you will get 657.
Step 3: Finally write the both step 1,step 2 answers together.342657 is the answer.                                   
​343 × 999                                                                
Step 1:  343-1= 342
Step 2:   999-342=657                         
Step 3: 342657 (Answer)
​NOTE: If no of 9’s are more than no of digits in number means just add 0’s infront of the number.(eg:00123× 99999).If no of digits in number is more than no of 9’s means dont use this technique.

8. 35^2 
We need to calculate square for 35, The given number is ending with 5. So use this below shortcut (calculate square and number ending with 5)
Step 1: unit digit 5 x 5 = 25
Step 2: second digit 3 x (3+1) = 12
Ans : write step2 ans, step1 ans together = 1225
Step 1: 5 x 5 = 25
Step 2: 3 x (3+1) = 12
Step 3: Write the both step2,step1 answers together,
Ans = 1225
9. 23 x 27 (Type 1) (Unit digit is different, second digit is same, sum of unit digit is 10)
Step 1: second digit x (second digit + 1)
2 x (2+1) = 6 ;
Step 2 : Unit digit x Unit digit
3 x 7 = 21 ;
Step 3 : write both step 1 step 2 answers together,
Answer = 621.
10. 44^2
( 50 – 6 )^2
Step 1 : 50^2 = 2500
Step 2 : 6 x 100 = 600
Step 3 : 6^2 = 36
Step 4 : step 1 – step 2 + step 3 = 2500 – 600 + 36 = 1936.​
Answer = 1936.
For Eg : 38^2
(50-12)^2
50^2 = 2500;
12×100 = 1200;
12^2 = 144
2500-1200+144 = 1444
11. √3844
We need to calculate square root of 3844.
Step 1: Split the number into two parts 38, 44 (last two digits are one part, remaining are one part); 44 is ending with 4 so the unit digit of square root ending with only 2 or 8.
2^2 = 4 ; 8^2 = 64 ;
Step 2: First part 38 is in between 6^2 to 7^2 (between 36 to 49)
so the second digit of square root is 6 or 7. In this case always you should take small number. Here small number is 6. 
Step 3: We have found one digit is 6, what is the unit digit? (2 or 8). For this, take first part 38 which is close to 6^2 to 7^2. It is close to 6^2 (36) only. so take 6 as second digit. 
Step 4: Write first part answer(3) and second part answer(2) together.Hence Answer is 62.
12. 32421 x 11
Step 1: Add 0 before and after the number  0324210
Step 2: add digits right to left 0+1=1, 1+2=3, 2+4=6, 4+2=6, 2+3=5, 3+0=3
Step 3: write the added result together from right 356631.
For Eg: 11 x 11 
Step 1: 0110
Step 2: 0+1=1; 1+1=2; 1+0=1
Step 1: Ans = 121.
13. ∛39304

Table For Square And Cube
NUMBER SQUARE CUBE
1 1 1
2 4 8
3 9 27
4 16 64
5 25 125
6 36 216
7 49 343
8 64 512
9 81 729
10 100 1000
11 121 1331
12 144 1728
13 169 2107
14 196 2744
15 225 3375
16 256 4096
17 289 4913
18 324 5832
19 361 6859
20 400 8000

We need to find cube root of 39304, see the above table
Step 1: Split the number into two parts 39, 304 (last three digits are one part, remaining are one part);
Note* : For square root calculations (we have splitted last two digits are one part, remaining are one part). for square and cube root we should know values from 1^2—— to 25^2,1^3—–to 10^3 are necessary​.
​304 is ending with 4 so the unit digit of cube root ending with only 4.4^3 = 64 ;
Step 2: First part 39 is in between 3^3 to 4^3 (between 27 to 64) so the second digit of square root is 3 or 4. In this case always you should take small number. Here small number is 3. 
Step 3: We have found second digit 3, the unit digit is 4. 
Step 4: Hence Answer is 34.
14. 74 x 76 (Type 1) (Unit digit is different, second digit is same, sum of unit digit is 10)
Step 1: second digit x (second digit + 1)
7 x (7+1) = 56 ; 
Step 2 : Unit digit x Unit digit
4 x 6 = 24 ;
Step 3 : write both step 1 step 2 answers together,
Answer = 5624.
15. 97 x 96 
Step 1 : (100-3) x (100-4)
Step 2 : (97 – 4 = 93) OR (96 – 3 = 93)
Step 3 : 3 x 4 = 12
Step 4 : write Step 2,Step 3 Answes together 9312.
Answer = 9312.

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *

Back to top button

Adblock Detected

Turnoff the Ad Blocker to view the content